Beaulieu, Joseph Andre Marc (CPSO#: 52578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Agency of Canada
Room 1018. Address Locator 6201C
100 Colonnade
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: (613) 941-6067
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital- Civic Campus
Neurology Clinic, C-2
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 17932
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ANDRE MARC BEAULIEU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAULIEU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1987