Beaulieu, Roland George (CPSO#: 53344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1371 Neilson Road
Suite 409
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 282-9198
Fax: (416) 282-9897
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. G. Beaulieu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beaulieu ( CPSO# 53344 )

Business Address:
409 - 1371 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 282-9198

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROLAND GEORGE BEAULIEU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAULIEU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1985