Beaver, Julia Ann Lucas (CPSO#: 33752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Julia & John Beaver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Beaver ( CPSO# 33708 )
Dr. J. Beaver ( CPSO# 33752 )

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0750

Business Address:
78909 McIlwain Line
Goderich ON  N7A 3X8
Phone Number: (519) 427-4631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA ANN LUCAS BEAVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAVER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1984