Beaver, Susan Ann (CPSO#: 59325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
476 Palmerston Boulevard
Toronto ON  M6G 2P1
Phone: (416) 588-9525
Fax: (416) 588-0524
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Faizal Ali and Dr. Susan Beaver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 59967 )
Dr. S. Beaver ( CPSO# 59325 )

Business Address:
476 Palmerston Boulevard
Toronto ON  M6G 2P1
Phone Number: (416) 588-8681

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ANN BEAVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1990