Bebawy, Amany Lotfy Farwiz (CPSO#: 78049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5A
1289 Marlborough Court
Oakville ON  L6H 2R9
Phone: (905) 844-8878
Fax: (905) 844-8868
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANY LOTFY FARWIZ BEBAWY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEBAWY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004