Bechamp, Robert Richard (CPSO#: 93058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Crescent Oral Surgery
1940 Eglinton Ave. East Suite 500
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1
Canada
Phone: (416) 752-5222
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Crescent Oral Surgery
9251 Yonge Street Suite 400
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9T3
Canada
Phone: (905) 889-8006
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Crescent Oral Surgery
236 Wellington St E Suite 200
Aurora ON  L4G 1J5
Canada
Phone: (905) 713-9990
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

GTA Endoscopy Services Inc.
305 Milner Ave, Unit 920
Scarborough ON  M1B 3V4
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-3883
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
7155 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 946-0222
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Digestive Health Clinic
1031 Brock Rd
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-1700
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Digestive Health Clinic
330 York Regional Rd 7
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Canada
Phone: (905) 707-5007
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Upper Canada Lower Bowel Clinic
1366 Yonge St.
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 926-0262
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Bechamp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bechamp ( CPSO# 93058 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
500 - 1940 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1
Phone Number: (416) 752-5222

Business Address:
400 - 9251 Yonge Street
York ON  L4C 9T3
Phone Number: (905) 889-8006

Business Address:
200 - 236 Wellington Street East
York ON  L4G 1J5
Phone Number: (905) 713-9990

Business Address:
920 - 305 Milner Avenue
Toronto ON  M1B 3V4
Phone Number: (416) 321-3883

Business Address:
7155 Woodbine Avenue
York ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 946-0222

Business Address:
1031 Brock Road
Durham ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-1700

Business Address:
330 York Regional Road 7
York ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Business Address:
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 926-0262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT RICHARD BECHAMP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECHAMP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2016