Beck, Carolyn Elizabeth (CPSO#: 72285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatrics
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8422
Fax: (416) 813-8345
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN ELIZABETH BECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002