Beck, Cynthia Anita (CPSO#: 70449)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Oct 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2000