Beck, Gail Maureen (CPSO#: 52088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6288
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gail Beck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Beck ( CPSO# 52088 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 25 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAIL MAUREEN BECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1984