Beck, Iain Vincent (CPSO#: 63755)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CF H Svcs Gp HQ
D Med Pol PC
NDHQ (Carling)
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: (613) 945-2780
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ontario Addiction Treatment Centres
Ottawa West Clinic
1318 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K8
Canada
Phone: 613-627-0856
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Med-Team Clinic
99 Kakulu Rd
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Canada
Phone: (613) 592-1448
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I.V. Beck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Beck ( CPSO# 63755 )

Business Address:
1318 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K8
Phone Number: (613) 627-0856

Business Address:
401 Somerset Street West
Ottawa ON  K2P 1K0

Business Address:
263 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1L 6C4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAIN VINCENT BECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On July 8, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in London, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Beck.