Beck, Raphael (CPSO#: 50128)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001