Becker, Lorne Arthur (CPSO#: 23446)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Mar 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994