Becker, Maria Jesus (CPSO#: 32818)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Chile, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical records requests should be directed to: Student Health Services Brock University St. Catharines, ON L2S 3A1 Tel: (905) 688-5550
Date Received: 04 Jun 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008