Becker, Taryn (CPSO#: 77646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
511 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 439-8353
Fax: (416) 438-6503
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Building A
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Canada
Phone: 416-431-8149
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Becker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Becker ( CPSO# 77646 )

Business Address:
Building A
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 431-8149

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Suite 511
3030 Lawrence Avenure East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 439-8353

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARYN BECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2006