Beckett, Andrew Neil (CPSO#: 93967)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2014