Becks, Gregory Philip (CPSO#: 50129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
P O Box 1800
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 371-0563
Fax: (519) 371-9304
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory P. Becks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Becks ( CPSO# 50129 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Suite 7202
PO Box 1800
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 371-0563

Business Address:
90 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1
Phone Number: (519) 364-2340

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY PHILIP BECKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1987