Bedard, Andre Valentin (CPSO#: 71585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
7869 Yonge Street
Innisfil ON  L9S 1K8
Phone: (705) 436-2251
Fax: (705) 436-7991
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Geogian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Bedard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bedard ( CPSO# 71585 )

Business Address:
1 - 7869 Yonge Street
Innisfil ON  L9S 1K8
Phone Number: (705) 436-2251

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 1G4
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRE VALENTIN BEDARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 9, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)