Bedard, Philippe Lucien (CPSO#: 79386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
OPG Building, 7th Floor 7-723
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-4534
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philippe L. Bedard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bedard ( CPSO# 79386 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
OPG Building 7th Floor, 7-723
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 946-4534

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIPPE LUCIEN BEDARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007