Beddage, Victorine Yogalosani (CPSO#: 53627)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:University of Ceylon, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Mental Health Clinic 120 King Street West North Bay ON P1B 5Z7
Date Received: 28 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017