Beder, Aaron Leslie (CPSO#: 68308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
1017 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone: (416) 742-2961
Fax: (416) 742-0076
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Beder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Beder ( CPSO# 68308 )

Business Address:
Suite 401
1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 742-2961

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 28 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON LESLIE BEDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999