Bedessee, Manwel (CPSO#: 22919)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Durham, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address:  Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Manwel Bedessee PO Box 48009 Kitchener, Ontario N2E 4K6
Date Received: 04 Jun 2009


Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Mrs. Daphne Bedessee Tel: 519-696-3993
Date Received: 16 Apr 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2008