Bedessee, Zena (CPSO#: 65527)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 6
715 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone: (519) 621-2424
Fax: (855) 530-6121
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zena Bedessee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Bedessee ( CPSO# 65527 )

Business Address:
Suite 6
715 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone Number: (519) 621-2424

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZENA BEDESSEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDESSEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993