Bedson, Lisa Marie (CPSO#: 69462)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Adelaide, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 23 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2009