Beeston, Jeffery Philip (CPSO#: 66582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrew's Drive
P O Box 760
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-1300 Ext. 1501
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

349 King st
Midland ON  L4R 3M7
Canada
Phone: (705) 527-4641
Fax: (705) 527-4697
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. P. Beeston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Beeston ( CPSO# 66582 )

Business Address:
Huronia District Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
349 King Street
Midland ON  L4R 3M7
Phone Number: (705) 527-4641

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFERY PHILIP BEESTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEESTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995