Begin, Marie Helene Julie (CPSO#: 65620)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Abbey Medical Centre
1131 Nottinghill Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1K5
Phone: (905) 815-9090
Fax: (905) 815-1834
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE HELENE JULIE BEGIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEGIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Jun 1992 to 28 Jun 1993
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1994