Behan, Lucy-Ann (CPSO#: 99206)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2014