Behar, Beatriz Maria Romero (CPSO#: 51574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 St Clair Avenue East
Apartment 903
Toronto ON  M4T 2V7
Phone: (416) 960-1116
Fax: (416) 261-3135
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEATRIZ MARIA ROMERO BEHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1986