Behar, Natan (CPSO#: 27707)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish, Turkish

Education:Istanbul University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natan Behar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 5 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 200 171 Montreal Road Cornwall ON K6H 1B2
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017