Behar, Ronen (CPSO#: 86511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
2125 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Phone: (905) 827-4304
Fax: 905-827-4300
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Behar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Behar ( CPSO# 86511 )

Business Address:
4 - 2125 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Phone Number: (905) 827-4304

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONEN BEHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2011