Beheshti, Behnam (CPSO#: 84775)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2011