Behesnilian, Katyg (CPSO#: 53485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, Ethiopian

Education:Erevan Medical Institute, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Health Centre
Morrow Wing
5th Floor-CMHC
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 3293
Fax: (416) 530-6076
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katyg Behesnilian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Behesnilian ( CPSO# 53485 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Suite 5G-128
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATYG BEHESNILIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHESNILIAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1986