Behki, Rama Rani (CPSO#: 57336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1988


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverside Eye Care Center, TOH
1967 Riverside Drive
Suite 323
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8537
Fax: (613) 738-8394
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

29 Ducharme Street
Gatineau QC  J8Y 3P7
Phone: (819) 770-3663
Fax: (819) 770-1066
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rama Behki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2005

Dr. R. Behki ( CPSO# 57336 )

Business Address:
Riverside Eye Care Center TOH
1967 Riverside Drive
Suite 323
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8537

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.


Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa


Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. RAMA RANI BEHKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1988