Behki, Subita (CPSO#: 63685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medcan Clinic
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5927
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Behki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Behki ( CPSO# 63685 )

Business Address:
The Medcan Clinic
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUBITA BEHKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1992