Behm, Ernest Peter (CPSO#: 64486)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2012