Behme, Nancy Ann (CPSO#: 63808)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
520 Sarnia Road, Unit 3
London ON  N6G 5A3
Phone: (519) 657-0002
Fax: (519) 657-0003
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY ANN BEHME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHME is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1992