Behrouz, Sara (CPSO#: 100410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone: (905) 770-9096
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

181 Green Lane East
East Gwillimbury ON  L9N 0C9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sara Behrouz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Behrouz ( CPSO# 100410)

Business Address:
Suite 2
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone Number: (905) 770-9096

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA BEHROUZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHROUZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2016