Behzadi, Abdollah (CPSO#: 81843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Center
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 1841
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite B 2206
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 439-5866
Fax: (416) 439-8776
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Behzadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 9 2012


Corporation Name: Behzadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Behzadi ( CPSO# 81843 )

Business Address:
2206 - 3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Building B
Toronto ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 439-5866

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglintoni Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDOLLAH BEHZADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHZADI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2004