Beiko, George Hutul Hachkowski (CPSO#: 57630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Ukrainian

Education:Oxford University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Vine Street
Suite 103
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone: (905) 687-8322
Fax: (905) 687-8766
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Beiko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Beiko ( CPSO# 57630 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
180 Vine Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 687-8322

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Jamaica
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE HUTUL HACHKOWSKI BEIKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEIKO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1987