Bejuk, Marta Kamila (CPSO#: 89320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2525 Old Bronte Rd #360
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 582-8789
Fax: (905) 582-5005
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Milton General Hospital
7030 Derry Rd
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marta Bejuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bejuk ( CPSO# 89320 )

Business Address:
360 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 582-8789

Business Address:
Milton General Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTA KAMILA BEJUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEJUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014