Belanger, Daniel (CPSO#: 60313)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990