Belanger, Joseph Melvine Eric Garry (CPSO#: 23451)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Feb 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2011