Belanger, Marie Simone Gisele (CPSO#: 82570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20260 County Road #43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Canada
Phone: 613 525 2222
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.S. Gisele Belanger Medicine Professional Corporation/M.S. Gisele Belanger Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Belanger ( CPSO# 82570 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Business Address:
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20260 Country Road
Highway 43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 525-2222

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE SIMONE GISELE BELANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELANGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007