Belanger, Monique Helene Marie (CPSO#: 63801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1992


Former Name: Lafreniere, Monique Helene Marie (used until: 18 Jun 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
19 Frood Road
Sudbury ON  P3C 4Y9
Phone: (705) 670-2274
Fax: (705) 670-2277
Electoral District: 08


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MONIQUE HELENE MARIE BELANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELANGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992