Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Belanger, Raymond (CPSO#: 22381)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Jul 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011