Belchetz, Lance Adam (CPSO#: 69088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Canadian Place Endoscopy
1065 Canadian Pl #123
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lance A. Belchetz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Belchetz ( CPSO# 69088 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4530

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LANCE ADAM BELCHETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELCHETZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1997