Belcon, Michael Carver (CPSO#: 29424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1977

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Howard University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7600 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8B7
Phone: 2893713500
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

90 Resolution Drive
Unit 2
Brampton ON  L6W0A7
Canada
Phone: 8558547325
Fax: 9054599474
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Georgia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CARVER BELCON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELCON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977

Concerns

Source: FSMB
Active Date: August 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On August 22, 2017, the Florida Board of Medicine approved and adopted a Settlement Agreement between Dr. Belcon and the Florida Department of Health as an Order of the Board. Dr. Belcon was alleged to have been terminated from the Florida Medicaid program, and the following penalties were imposed: a Letter of Concern; a fine of $3,000; and reimbursement of Department of Health incurred in the investigation and prosecution of the case. The College was notified of this finding by a report received on August 22, 2017.