Belfon, Ahmad Eddie (CPSO#: 81432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 697-3607
Fax: (905) 697-3645
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmad Belfon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Belfon ( CPSO# 81432 )

Business Address:
Suite 3101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 697-3607

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMAD EDDIE BELFON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELFON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006