Belford, Paul Douglas (CPSO#: 25707)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Apr 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Apr 1993