Belhaj, Abdelbaset (CPSO#: 80931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Centenary site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 7442
Fax: (416) 281-7384
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health
Ajax and Pickering site
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 4221
Fax: (905) 428-5335
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdelbaset Belhaj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Belhaj ( CPSO# 80931 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDELBASET BELHAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELHAJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2004 to 09 Jul 2004
PEAP - Resident - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 10 Jul 2004 to 13 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 14 Jul 2005 to 13 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 14 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 13 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 14 Jul 2007 to 13 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 14 Jul 2008 to 13 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2009