Bell, Alane Elisabeth (CPSO#: 55812)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 16 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Names: Bell-Leong, Alane Elisabeth (used until: 16 Mar 2009 )     Bell, Alane Elisabeth (used until: 25 Jun 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 980 Queenston Road Stoney Creek, ON L8G 1B9 Or 1275 Rymal Road Hamilton, ON L8W 3N1
Date Received: 16 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2015